SD HB1127 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2018 H.J. 614
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2018 H.J. 614
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to fees charged for security freezes.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to fees charged for security freezes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2018 H.J. 614 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 21, 2018 H.J. 520 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 513 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 481 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 471 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 445 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 388 |
2018-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 335 |
2018-02-02 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-02 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 308 |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 147 |