SD HB1135 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-3)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Failed, YEAS 24, NAYS 43. H.J. 497
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Failed, YEAS 24, NAYS 43. H.J. 497
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide certain provisions requiring plaintiffs in certain civil suits to cover certain court costs.
Title
Provide certain provisions requiring plaintiffs in certain civil suits to cover certain court costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 24 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Do Not Pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Do Not Pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Failed, YEAS 24, NAYS 43. H.J. 497 |
2017-02-21 | House | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7), Passed H.J. 429 |
2017-02-21 | House | Judiciary Do Not Pass as amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 444 |
2017-02-21 | House | Judiciary Reconsidered, Passed |
2017-02-13 | House | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 369 |
2017-02-13 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1135wb |
2017-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 228 |