SD HB1143 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2018 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2018 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the tax exemption of certain school owned property.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the tax exemption of certain school owned property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2018 H.J. 544 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 21, 2018 H.J. 520 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 513 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 430 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 439 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 422 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 396 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 331 |
2018-01-31 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 19. H.J. 260 |
2018-01-30 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 4. H.J. 218 |
2018-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 151 |