SD HB1147 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 38. H.J. 306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 38. H.J. 306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the definition of bona fide practitioner-patient relationship in relation to medical cannabis.
Title
Revise the definition of bona fide practitioner-patient relationship in relation to medical cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - House - House Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 38. H.J. 306 |
2021-02-16 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. |
2021-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 178 |
2021-01-28 | House | First Reading House H.J. 148 |