SD HB1179 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require certain campaign finance requirements to apply to all counties and municipalities.
Title
Require certain campaign finance requirements to apply to all counties and municipalities.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Rep. Bob Deelstra [R] | Rep. Kent Juhnke [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] |
Sen. Daniel Lederman [R] | Rep. Scott Munsterman [R] | Sen. Deb Peters [R] | Sen. Todd Schlekeway [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor H.J. 727 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by President S.J. 623 | |
2012-02-28 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 662 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 585 | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 548 | |
2012-02-22 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 497 | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-14 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 406 | |
2012-02-13 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 443 | |
2012-02-09 | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 396 | |
2012-02-09 | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1179tb | |
2012-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-02 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 156 |