SD HB1189 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2023 H.J. 518
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2023 H.J. 518
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require certain entities owning agricultural land to report foreign beneficial ownership interests.
Title
Require certain entities owning agricultural land to report foreign beneficial ownership interests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2023 H.J. 518 |
2023-03-02 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 02, 2023 H.J. 450 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 372 |
2023-02-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 395 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 338 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 27 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 27 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 261 |
2023-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 286 |
2023-02-09 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 11 |
2023-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 179 |