SD HB1210 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 689
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 689
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to the Board of Regents to provide grant funding for a new biomedical facility at the research park in Sioux Falls, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to the Board of Regents to provide grant funding for a new biomedical facility at the research park in Sioux Falls, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Referred to (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Referred to (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 689 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 686 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 538 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 684 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 506 |
2022-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 17. H.J. 647 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. Amendment 1210B |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 492 |
2022-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 631 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 471 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 470 Amendment 1210A |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 456 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 379 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 330 |
2022-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 17. H.J. 432 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 8. H.J. 429 |
2022-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7) House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 429 |
2022-02-22 | House | Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. |
2022-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 156 |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 139 |