SD HB1214 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 874
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 874
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulate conflicts of interest for authority, board, or commission members.
Title
Regulate conflicts of interest for authority, board, or commission members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 874 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2016 H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 555 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 767 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 491 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-29 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 467 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 323 |
2016-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 401 |
2016-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 401 Amendment 1214sb |
2016-02-10 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 354 |
2016-02-10 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1214sa |
2016-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 283 |