SD HB1217 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Veto override, Failed, YEAS 45, NAYS 24. H.J. 575
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Veto override, Failed, YEAS 45, NAYS 24. H.J. 575
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Promote continued fairness in women's sports.
Title
Promote continued fairness in women's sports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Veto override (Y: 45 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Approval of style and form veto (Y: 2 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Approval of style and form veto (Y: 2 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Veto override, Failed, YEAS 45, NAYS 24. H.J. 575 |
2021-03-29 | House | Delivered Style and Form Not Approved H.J. 573 |
2021-03-29 | House | Approval of style and form veto, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 67. H.J. 572 |
2021-03-29 | House | Vetoed for Style and Form H.J. 570 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 470 |
2021-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 H.J. 547 |
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 541 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 15. S.J. 433 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 16. S.J. 432 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | State Affairs Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7) Senate State Affairs, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 18. S.J. 416 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 1 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 350 |
2021-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 17. H.J. 385 |
2021-02-22 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. |
2021-02-22 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1217A |
2021-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 194 |