SD HB1234 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - House Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 446
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - House Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 446
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide funding to schools from the contractor's excise tax on concentrated animal feeding operations.
Title
Provide funding to schools from the contractor's excise tax on concentrated animal feeding operations.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Post [R] | Sen. Arch Beal [R] | Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Rep. Kirk Chaffee [R] |
Rep. Drew Dennert [R] | Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] | Rep. Caleb Finck [R] | Rep. Spencer Gosch [R] |
Rep. Lana Greenfield [R] | Rep. Randy Gross [R] | Rep. Taffy Howard [R] | Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] |
Rep. Chris Johnson [R] | Sen. David Johnson [R] | Rep. Lance Koth [R] | Rep. Isaac Latterell [R] |
Rep. Sam Marty [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Rep. Kent Peterson [R] | Rep. Sue Lucas-Peterson [R] |
Sen. Tom Pischke [R] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Sen. Kyle Schoenfish [R] |
Rep. Manny Steele [R] | Rep. Kaleb Weis [R] | Rep. Marli Wiese [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Rep. Rocky Blare [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Sen. Lynn Disanto [R] |
Sen. Jack Kolbeck [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. VJ Smith [R] | Sen. John Wiik [R] |
Sen. Jordan Youngberg [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 446 |
2019-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 373 |
2019-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 356 |
2019-02-07 | House | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 316 |
2019-02-07 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1234yb |
2019-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to House Taxation H.J. 280 |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 259 |