SD HB1236 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding commissions received by insurance producers.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding commissions received by insurance producers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 738 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 644 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 613 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 601 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 568 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 536 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 486 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1236cc |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 394 |
2015-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 388 |
2015-02-09 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 339 |
2015-02-09 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1236oa |
2015-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-04 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 286 |