SD HB1238 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-7)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-7)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the powers and duties of the Executive Board of the Legislative Research Council.
Title
Revise the powers and duties of the Executive Board of the Legislative Research Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 H.J. 881 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 860 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 787 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 504 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-29 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 468 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1238oa |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 361 |
2016-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 446 |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-17 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 408 |
2016-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 289 |