SD HB1238 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
License and regulate out-of-state multi-jurisdictional totalizator hubs.
Title
License and regulate out-of-state multi-jurisdictional totalizator hubs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - House Local Government: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to House Local Government H.J. 212 |
2021-02-03 | House | First Reading House H.J. 190 |
Subjects
South Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://sdlegislature.gov/#/Session/Bill/22371 |
Text | https://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/216123.pdf |
Roll Call | https://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/69542 |