SD HB1242 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 608
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 608
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the general appropriations act for fiscal year 2012.
Title
Revise the general appropriations act for fiscal year 2012.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Tabled (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Reconsidered (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Reconsidered (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 608 | |
2012-02-27 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 571 | |
2012-02-27 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1242me | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-23 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 439 | |
2012-02-14 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 4. H.J. 472 | |
2012-02-13 | Appropriations Title amended, Passed Amendment 1242mtb | |
2012-02-13 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 426 | |
2012-02-13 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1242mc | |
2012-02-13 | Appropriations Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. | |
2012-02-09 | Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. H.J. 404 | |
2012-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 217 |