SD HB1270 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 21, NAYS 46. H.J. 525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protect the teaching of certain scientific information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect the teaching of certain scientific information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 21, NAYS 46. H.J. 525
2019-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 486
2019-02-20HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 6. H.J. 458
2019-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31HouseReferred to House Education H.J. 282
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 266

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback