SD HB1309 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 34. H.J. 537
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 34. H.J. 537
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a periodic review of the sales and use tax exemptions.
Title
Provide for a periodic review of the sales and use tax exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Taxation Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Taxation Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 34. H.J. 537 |
2018-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Hoghoused, Passed H.J. 537 Amendment 1309fc |
2018-02-15 | House | Taxation Title amended, Passed H.J. 471 Amendment 1309fta |
2018-02-15 | House | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 6. |
2018-02-15 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. Amendment 1309fb |
2018-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-13 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2018-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 289 |