SD HCR1017 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Failed, YEAS 13, NAYS 21. S.J. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Failed, YEAS 13, NAYS 21. S.J. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urging Congress, the White House Office of National Drug Control Policy (ONDCP), the United States Department of Justice, and the United States Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA) to recognize industrial hemp as a valuable agricultural commodity.
Title
Urging Congress, the White House Office of National Drug Control Policy (ONDCP), the United States Department of Justice, and the United States Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA) to recognize industrial hemp as a valuable agricultural commodity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Failed, YEAS 13, NAYS 21. S.J. 363 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 344 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 412 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 355 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 336 |