SD HJR1001 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 15, NAYS 19. S.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing and submitting to the voters at the next general election an amendment to the Constitution of the State of South Dakota regarding appointments to fill legislative vacancies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing and submitting to the voters at the next general election an amendment to the Constitution of the State of South Dakota regarding appointments to fill legislative vacancies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseSenate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 15, NAYS 19. S.J. 650
2019-03-06HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 624
2019-03-06HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. Amendment j1001ca
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26HouseFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 521
2019-02-25SenateHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 25. H.J. 529
2019-02-25SenateHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 529 Amendment j1001bb
2019-02-20SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3. H.J. 458
2019-02-20SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment j1001wa
2019-02-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 200

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=HJR1001&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HJR1001P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HJR1001HST.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HJR1001H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HJR1001SST.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28523&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28819&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29234&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29236&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29300&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback