SD SB100 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 46-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 46-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish certain provisions related to grant monitoring and review and to revise certain record retention policies.
Title
Establish certain provisions related to grant monitoring and review and to revise certain record retention policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793 |
2018-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 S.J. 776 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 760 |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 749 |
2018-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 687 |
2018-03-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 663 |
2018-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 576 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 571 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Fiscal Note Requested, Passed S.J. 468 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Title amended, Passed S.J. 414 Amendment 100mta |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 100kb |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 269 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 174 |
Subjects
Public Fiscal Administration
Public Property, Purchases and Contracts
Public Records
School Districts
State Affairs and Government
Public Property, Purchases and Contracts
Public Records
School Districts
State Affairs and Government