SD SB114 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide that parties to a divorce or separate maintenance action be restrained from making changes to insurance coverage.
Title
Provide that parties to a divorce or separate maintenance action be restrained from making changes to insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 645 | |
2011-03-07 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 652 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by President S.J. 616 | |
2011-03-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 606 | |
2011-03-01 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 584 | |
2011-02-28 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 543 | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-23 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 493 | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 485 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 470 | |
2011-02-15 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 427 | |
2011-02-15 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 114ja | |
2011-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 195 |