SD SB136 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize certain witnesses to be accompanied by a certified therapeutic dog in a criminal proceeding.
Title
Authorize certain witnesses to be accompanied by a certified therapeutic dog in a criminal proceeding.
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Soholt [R] | Sen. Richard Curd [R] | Sen. Helene Duhamel [R] | Sen. Red Foster [D] |
Sen. Kris Langer [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] | Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] | Sen. VJ Smith [R] |
Rep. Ryan Cwach [D] | Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Rep. Doug Barthel [R] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] |
Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Erin Healy [D] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Sen. Timothy Johns [R] |
Sen. Herman Otten [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Rebecca Reimer [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 S.J. 558 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 475 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 14. H.J. 528 |
2020-03-04 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-04 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 433 |
2020-02-24 | House | First Reading House H.J. 360 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 310 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 136A |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 118 |