SD SB138 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to enhance education by revising the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2013.
Title
Make an appropriation to enhance education by revising the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Education Referred as Amended to House Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Education Referred as Amended to House Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 736 |
2013-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-03-04 | House | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 685 |
2013-03-04 | House | Appropriations Title amended, Passed Amendment 138mta |
2013-03-04 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 138ma |
2013-02-27 | House | Education Title amended, Passed Amendment 138cta |
2013-02-27 | House | Education Referred as Amended to House Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 1. H.J. 567 |
2013-02-27 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 138ca |
2013-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-25 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2013-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-22 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2013-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 437 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 438 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 437 Amendment 138ja |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 392 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 383 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 354 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 169 |