SD SB138 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2022 S.J. 376
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2022 S.J. 376
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify provisions related to filing a petition to refer an ordinance or resolution.
Title
Clarify provisions related to filing a petition to refer an ordinance or resolution.
Sponsors
Sen. Helene Duhamel [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2022 S.J. 376 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 17, 2022 S.J. 292 |
2022-02-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 353 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 262 |
2022-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 283 |
2022-02-10 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2022-02-10 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-04 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 212 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 173 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 130 |