SD SB14 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 607
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 607
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding alcohol or drug commitments.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding alcohol or drug commitments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 607 | |
2012-02-22 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 499 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 538 | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by President S.J. 473 | |
2012-02-15 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 4. H.J. 494 | |
2012-02-14 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 454 | |
2012-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 201 | |
2012-01-24 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 160 | |
2012-01-23 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 119 | |
2012-01-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 15 |