SD SB148 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize additional nursing facility beds for the Michael J. Fitzmaurice Veterans Home and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize additional nursing facility beds for the Michael J. Fitzmaurice Veterans Home and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2016 S.J. 619 |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 861 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 819 |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 798 |
2016-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 781 |
2016-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 766 |
2016-03-01 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 730 |
2016-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 360 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 267 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 245 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 195 |