SD SB151 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify the maintenance responsibilities on unimproved section lines.
Title
Clarify the maintenance responsibilities on unimproved section lines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 756 |
2013-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 723 |
2013-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 815 |
2013-03-06 | House | Signed by President S.J. 703 |
2013-03-05 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 667 |
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 706 |
2013-03-04 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 640 Amendment cc151A |
2013-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 632 Amendment Cc151A |
2013-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 586 |
2013-02-27 | House | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 601 |
2013-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 523 |
2013-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 522 Amendment 151fi |
2013-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507 |
2013-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 491 |
2013-02-19 | House | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 430 |
2013-02-19 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 151oa |
2013-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-14 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 406 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 396 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 383 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 338 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 151fb |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 151fd |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 172 |