SD SB163 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-14)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-14)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit a social host from permitting the underage consumption of alcoholic beverages on the social host's premises and to provide penalties therefor.
Title
Prohibit a social host from permitting the underage consumption of alcoholic beverages on the social host's premises and to provide penalties therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 673 |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 652 |
2014-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 750 |
2014-03-11 | House | Signed by President S.J. 629 |
2014-03-10 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 10. S.J. 589 |
2014-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 9. H.J. 655 |
2014-03-03 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 604 |
2014-03-03 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 163jb |
2014-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-12 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 398 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 299 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 299 Amendment 163OC |
2014-02-07 | Senate | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 163ota |
2014-02-07 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. S.J. 254 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 163ta |
2014-02-07 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 163oa |
2014-02-07 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 163ob |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 197 |