SD SB169 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-13)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for access to and use of public waters on public and private property and to protect private property rights for the citizens of South Dakota.
Title
Provide for access to and use of public waters on public and private property and to protect private property rights for the citizens of South Dakota.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Tabled (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 351 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Deferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed S.J. 316 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 300 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 265 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 199 |