SD SB17 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Signed by Governor S.J. 484
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Signed by Governor S.J. 484
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding restricted driving permits for minors.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding restricted driving permits for minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Signed by Governor S.J. 484 | |
2010-02-24 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 457 | |
2010-02-23 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 591 | |
2010-02-22 | Signed by President S.J. 424 | |
2010-02-19 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 495 | |
2010-02-18 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-18 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 459 | |
2010-02-18 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-22 | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 162 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 110 | |
2010-01-20 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-01-20 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 88 | |
2010-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 16 |