SD SB179 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 365
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 365
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require that certain contested cases be heard by hearing examiners in the Office of Hearing Examiners.
Title
Require that certain contested cases be heard by hearing examiners in the Office of Hearing Examiners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Judiciary Tabled (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 365 | |
2010-02-18 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-16 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-11 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-11 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-03 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 226 |