SD SB181 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 22. S.J. 423
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 22. S.J. 423
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain tort liability arising out of causes of action based on seduction, abduction, and alienation of affections.
Title
Repeal certain tort liability arising out of causes of action based on seduction, abduction, and alienation of affections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 22. S.J. 423 | |
2012-02-13 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 379 | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-09 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 192 |