SD SB23 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 35, NAYS 35. H.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 35, NAYS 35. H.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate the two-year delay of certain rule changes that increase teacher certification fees.
Title
Eliminate the two-year delay of certain rule changes that increase teacher certification fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 35, NAYS 35. H.J. 640 | |
2010-02-25 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 618 | |
2010-02-24 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 606 | |
2010-02-23 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 590 | |
2010-02-22 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 560 | |
2010-02-19 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 498 | |
2010-02-18 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 476 | |
2010-02-17 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 455 | |
2010-02-16 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 409 | |
2010-02-12 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 387 | |
2010-02-11 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 374 | |
2010-02-10 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 359 | |
2010-02-09 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 340 | |
2010-02-04 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 317 | |
2010-02-03 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 305 | |
2010-02-02 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 277 | |
2010-02-01 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 252 | |
2010-01-28 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 234 | |
2010-01-27 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 5. H.J. 188 | |
2010-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-21 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 148 | |
2010-01-20 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 8. S.J. 98 | |
2010-01-19 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 77 | |
2010-01-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 17 |