SD SB25 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 S.J. 708
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 S.J. 708
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain fees for entities permitted under the national pollutant discharge elimination system.
Title
Revise certain fees for entities permitted under the national pollutant discharge elimination system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 S.J. 708 |
2018-02-27 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2018 S.J. 612 |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 611 |
2018-02-23 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 588 |
2018-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 14. H.J. 538 |
2018-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed H.J. 522 |
2018-02-20 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 501 |
2018-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 45, NAYS 19. H.J. 501 |
2018-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 480 |
2018-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 462 |
2018-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 430 |
2018-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 413 |
2018-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 391 |
2018-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 382 |
2018-02-06 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 353 |
2018-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 207 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 5. S.J. 232 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 192 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 17 |