SD SB25 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Signed by the Governor on March 02, 2023 S.J. 402
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Signed by the Governor on March 02, 2023 S.J. 402
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to reimburse health care professionals who have complied with the requirements for health care recruitment assistance programs and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to reimburse health care professionals who have complied with the requirements for health care recruitment assistance programs and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Joint - Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Joint - Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 02, 2023 S.J. 402 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2023 S.J. 347 |
2023-02-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 367 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 310 |
2023-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 325 |
2023-02-15 | House | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 307 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 262 |
2023-02-09 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. |
2023-02-09 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 25A |
2023-02-09 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2023-02-03 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 11 |