SD SB26 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Signed by the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Signed by the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify certain provisions regarding the regulation of limited gaming in Deadwood, South Dakota.
Title
Clarify certain provisions regarding the regulation of limited gaming in Deadwood, South Dakota.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Signed by the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 260 |
2019-01-29 | House | Delivered to the Governor on January 29, 2019 S.J. 211 |
2019-01-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 226 |
2019-01-25 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 194 |
2019-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 172 |
2019-01-23 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-23 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 155 |
2019-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-16 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 130 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 98 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 70 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 26 |