SD SB28 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 S.J. 466
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 S.J. 466
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require meningococcal immunization for school entry.
Title
Require meningococcal immunization for school entry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 S.J. 466 |
2016-02-22 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 22, 2016 S.J. 378 |
2016-02-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 470 |
2016-02-18 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 349 |
2016-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 25. H.J. 426 |
2016-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 405 |
2016-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 385 |
2016-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 373 |
2016-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 350 |
2016-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 330 |
2016-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 306 |
2016-02-04 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 274 |
2016-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 220 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 10. S.J. 154 |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 138 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 127 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 19 |