SD SB3 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the administration of the state seal.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the administration of the state seal.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Feickert [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Haverly [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Sen. J Putnam [R] |
Sen. Timothy Rave [R] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] | Sen. Dean Wink [R] | Sen. Susan Wismer [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-11 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 692 | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 688 | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 673 | |
2011-03-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 670 | |
2011-03-07 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-03-07 | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 3fta | |
2011-03-07 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 636 | |
2011-03-07 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 3fd | |
2011-03-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-03-02 | State Affairs Reconsidered, Passed | |
2011-02-23 | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 488 | |
2011-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-03 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 279 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 301 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 301 Amendment 3fb | |
2011-02-01 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 282 | |
2011-01-26 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 218 | |
2011-01-26 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 3oa | |
2011-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-19 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-01-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 15 |