SD SB33 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 707
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 707
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the 24/7 sobriety program, to authorize the collection of certain fees, and to authorize the use of ignition interlock devices.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the 24/7 sobriety program, to authorize the collection of certain fees, and to authorize the use of ignition interlock devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 707 | |
2011-03-11 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 692 | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 677 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 667 | |
2011-03-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 4. H.J. 641 | |
2011-03-07 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 641 Amendment 33ob | |
2011-03-03 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 620 | |
2011-03-02 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 609 | |
2011-02-28 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 544 | |
2011-02-28 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 33rb | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-08 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 320 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 340 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 336 Amendment 33oa | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 300 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 282 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 249 | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 215 | |
2011-01-25 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 190 | |
2011-01-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 21 |