SD SB51 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 S.J. 528
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 S.J. 528
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise property tax levies for school districts and to revise the state aid to general and special education formulas.
Title
Revise property tax levies for school districts and to revise the state aid to general and special education formulas.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Joint - Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Joint - Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 S.J. 528 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2024 S.J. 525 |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 510 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 523 |
2024-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 506 |
2024-03-07 | House | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 506 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 499 |
2024-03-05 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. |
2024-03-05 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 51A |
2024-03-05 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 58 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 18 |