SD SB59 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2018 S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2018 S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Department of Tourism to permit certain commercial advertising in information centers.
Title
Authorize the Department of Tourism to permit certain commercial advertising in information centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2018 S.J. 756 |
2018-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 06, 2018 S.J. 736 |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 689 |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 646 |
2018-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 2. H.J. 627 |
2018-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 611 |
2018-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 592 |
2018-02-22 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 545 |
2018-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 181 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 206 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 167 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 23 |