SD SB71 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-4)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 S.J. 476
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-4)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 S.J. 476
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions related to a license renewal for the practice of medicine, osteopathy, surgery, or obstetrics.
Title
Revise certain provisions related to a license renewal for the practice of medicine, osteopathy, surgery, or obstetrics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 S.J. 476 |
2018-02-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 08, 2018 S.J. 417 |
2018-02-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 382 |
2018-02-06 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 394 |
2018-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 346 |
2018-02-01 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 272 |
2018-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 207 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 231 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 169 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 71ka |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 65 |