SD SB88 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 743
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 743
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the definition of an electric transmission facility.
Title
Revise the definition of an electric transmission facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 743 |
2017-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2017 S.J. 677 |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 655 |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701 |
2017-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 655 |
2017-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 612 |
2017-03-01 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 587 |
2017-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-06 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 306 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 298 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 268 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 182 |