SD SB9 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to fund the Native American achievement schools grant program and paraprofessional tuition assistance scholarship program.
Title
Make an appropriation to fund the Native American achievement schools grant program and paraprofessional tuition assistance scholarship program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 S.J. 618 |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 861 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 6. H.J. 825 |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 804 |
2016-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 781 |
2016-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 766 |
2016-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 743 |
2016-02-29 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 723 |
2016-02-25 | House | First read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 699 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 436 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 2. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 9ga |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 162 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 160 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 15 |