SD SCR3 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 47-8)
Status: Enrolled on February 10 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 410
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 10 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 410
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the month of November as COPD Awareness Month in the State of South Dakota.
Title
Designating the month of November as COPD Awareness Month in the State of South Dakota.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 410 | |
2012-02-09 | Introduced H.J. 389 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 315 | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced S.J. 296 |