TN HB0064 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases, from three to four years, the duration of Tennessee opportunity pilot programs for which temporary assistance for needy families (TANF) program funds must be dedicated; extends, from 12 to 18 months, the length of time following the end of each federal fiscal year by which the department must spend all unobligated TANF program funds; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Section 71-5-1201; Section 71-5-1203 and Section 71-5-1204.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 71-5-1201; Section 71-5-1203 and Section 71-5-1204, relative to the distribution of funds from the temporary assistance for needy families program.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 51 | |
2023-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-06 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-03-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/6/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/2/2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/22/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-02-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/8/2023 |
2023-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-31 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2023-01-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 1/31/2023 |
2023-01-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2023-01-12 | House | Ref. to Health Committee--Finance, Ways & Measns Committee |
2023-01-11 | House | P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees |
2023-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0246 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Effective date(s) 03/21/2023