TN HB0129 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Pub. Ch. 437
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Pub. Ch. 437
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, directs human rights commission to develop a Title VI compliance plan applicable to certain state governmental entities; sets out duties of human rights commission in regards to Title VI provisions. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, directs human rights commission to develop a Title VI compliance plan applicable to certain state governmental entities; sets out duties of human rights commission in regards to Title VI provisions. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | Pub. Ch. 437 | |
2009-06-30 | Effective date(s) 07/01/09 | |
2009-06-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-12 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-06-11 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-10 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-09 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-06-08 | Passed S., Ayes 28, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-08 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-06-02 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-06-01 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-06-01 | Passed H., Ayes 81, Nays 13 | |
2009-05-28 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/09 | |
2009-05-28 | Reset on regular cal. for 6/1/09 | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/28/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-05-12 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 3/25/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 03/11/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 3/11/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 02/25/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-21 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0463 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 437
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0129&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0129.pdf |