TN HB0129 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the sunset date for the pilot program allowing golf carts on certain public roads to January 1, 2012; extends the pilot program to Eagleville, Englewood and Ripley; requires a person to have liability insurance on the golf cart in order to be authorized to operate it on the roadways. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, changes the sunset date for the pilot program allowing golf carts on certain public roads to January 1, 2012; extends the pilot program to Eagleville, Englewood and Ripley; requires a person to have liability insurance on the golf cart in order to be authorized to operate it on the roadways. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8, Part 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Pub. Ch. 126 | |
2011-05-10 | Effective date(s) 04/29/11 | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-04-19 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-04-15 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-04-12 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-04-12 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-04-11 | Passed S., Ayes 27, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-11 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-03-31 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-03-28 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-03-28 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2011-03-28 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA0106) | |
2011-03-28 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0070) | |
2011-03-28 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0069) | |
2011-03-28 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 4 of 0 - HA0107) | |
2011-03-24 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2011 | |
2011-03-15 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/15/2011 | |
2011-03-08 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/8/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Action Def. in s/c General Sub of Transportation to 3/8/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on s/c cal General Sub of Transportation for 2/22/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Transportation | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0134 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 126