TN HB0144 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires central procurement office to collect and maintain data regarding minority- and woman-owned businesses that contract with the state; requires the office to maintain an internet portal to make the data available to the public. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 9 and Title 12.
Title
As introduced, requires central procurement office to collect and maintain data regarding minority- and woman-owned businesses that contract with the state; requires the office to maintain an internet portal to make the data available to the public. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 9 and Title 12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2019-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0191 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee