TN HB0187 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits local government entities from imposing greater restrictions or requirements on privately owned or operated sport shooting ranges than are applicable to any range located within the same unit of local government and owned or operated by a government entity. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
As enacted, prohibits local government entities from imposing greater restrictions or requirements on privately owned or operated sport shooting ranges than are applicable to any range located within the same unit of local government and owned or operated by a government entity. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 223 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-17 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0045) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-25 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 5, PNV 2 |
2019-03-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0055) |
2019-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0446 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 223