TN HB0199 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the underground utility damage enforcement board two years to June 30, 2019; adds an attendance requirement for members of the board. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 65, Chapter 31.
Title
As enacted, extends the underground utility damage enforcement board two years to June 30, 2019; adds an attendance requirement for members of the board. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 65, Chapter 31.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 117 | |
2017-03-30 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-03-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass if am.; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0112 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 117